EP1069941 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS OR ANALYSIS SERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.R. Deutschland, vertr.d. Bundesministerium f. Wirtschaft u. Technologie, dieses vertr.d. Präs. d. Phys.-Techn. Bundesanstalt Bundesallee 100 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [2002/02] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR DIAGNOSTIKFORSCHUNG GmbH AN DER FREIEN UNIVERSITÄT BERLIN Spandauer Damm 130 14050 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Hans Lauterstrasse 39 D-12159 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SEMMLER, Wolfhard Jahnstrasse 17 D-13467 Berlin / DE | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 99924724.0 | 25.03.1999 | [2001/04] | WO1999DE00957 | Priority number, date | DE1998117531 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817531 | US19980090919P | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 90919 P | [2001/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9952625 | Date: | 21.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069941 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C07B61/00 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
B01J19/0046 (EP);
B01L3/0268 (EP);
B41J2/01 (EP);
B41J3/407 (EP);
B01J2219/00317 (EP);
B01J2219/00378 (EP);
B01J2219/00527 (EP);
B01J2219/00529 (EP);
B01J2219/00605 (EP);
B01J2219/00608 (EP);
B01J2219/0061 (EP);
B01J2219/00612 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANFERTIGUNG VON SYNTHESE- ODER ANALYSEREIHEN | [2001/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS OR ANALYSIS SERIES | [2001/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REALISER DES SERIES DE SYNTHESES ET D'ANALYSES | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/31] | Request for further processing for: | 08.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9745730 (BIODX) [X] 1,3,4,7,9-11,13 * abstract * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 11 * * page 18, line 18 - page 19, line 22 * * page 25, line 3 - line 19 * * page 34, line 13 - page 37, line 14 * * page 38, line 20 - page 39, line 11 * * figures 1,2,12,13,15,16; claim - * [A] 2,5,6,8,12; | [XA]WO9744134 (INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) [X] 1,2,4,9-13 * abstract * * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 30 * * page 11, line 24 - page 13, line 8 * * page 15, line 23 - line 30 * * page 18, line 29 - page 19, line 14 * * figures 6,10 * [A] 3,5-8; | [A]WO9743611 (AFFYMETRIX, INC.) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO9732212 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC.) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 15, line 16 - line 32 *; | [A]US5643798 (RONALD C. BEAVIS & BRIAN T. CHAIT) [A] 1-13 * column A * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 27 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5508200 (THOMAS TIFFANY ET AL.) [A] 1-13 * column A * * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 23 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 34 * * column 9, line 45 - line 62 * * figures 1-5,7,8,14-16 *; | [A] - A.SCHOBERT ET AL., "Accurate High-Speed Liquid Handling of Very Small Biological Samples", BIOTECHNIQUES., EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK., US, (1993), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 324 - 329, XP002121713 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - LEMMO A V ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF AN INKJET CHEMICAL MICRODISPENSER FOR COMBINATORIAL LIBRARY SYNTHESIS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19970215), vol. 69, no. 4, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 543 - 551, XP000681609 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac960808v |