EP1068624 - ENCAPSULATING MODULE WITH A THREE-POSITION SWITCH INTEGRATED INTO A CURRENT PATH FOR A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEINHERZ, Manfred Forststrasse 45 D-13467 Berlin / DE | 02 /
DAMBIETZ, Hans-Peter Gliensteig 1 D-13589 Berlin / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 99924754.7 | 26.03.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999DE01004 | Priority number, date | DE19981016361 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816361 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9952119 | Date: | 14.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068624 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068624 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
H01H1/38 (EP);
H02B13/035 (EP);
H01H31/003 (EP);
H01H33/24 (EP);
H01H9/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [2001/03] | Title | German: | KAPSELUNGSBAUSTEIN MIT EINEM IN EINE STROMBAHN INTEGRIERTEN DREI-STELLUNGS-SCHALTER FÜR EINE GASISOLIERTE SCHALTANLAGE | [2001/03] | English: | ENCAPSULATING MODULE WITH A THREE-POSITION SWITCH INTEGRATED INTO A CURRENT PATH FOR A GAS-INSULATED SWITCHGEAR INSTALLATION | [2001/03] | French: | MODULE D'ENCAPSULAGE DOTE D'UN COMMUTATEUR A TROIS POSITIONS INTEGRE DANS UN CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE ET DESTINE A UN EQUIPEMENT ELECTRIQUE ISOLE PAR UN GAZ | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2002
09.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH Opponent's representative ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2002
09.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH Opponent's representative ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.2002
ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5401 Baden / CH Opponent's representative ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | 08.11.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.03.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/34] | 04.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.03.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3876846 (GRAYBILL HOWARD W) [Y] 1 * column 4, paragraph L - column 5, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]FR1441239 (NV) [Y] 1 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [A]DE3743544 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) [A] 2; | [DA]EP0824264 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]DE29806211U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PA] * the whole document * | Examination | DE2414200 |