EP1077953 - BISOXIMETHER DERIVATIVES, METHODS AND INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND THEIR USE FOR COMBATING FUNGICIDAL PESTS AND ANIMAL PESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Herbert D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
GÖTZ, Roland St.-Josefs-Gasse 18 D-67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
KEIL, Michael Fontanestrasse 4 D-67251 Freinsheim / DE | 04 /
SAUTER, Hubert Neckarpromenade 20 D-68167 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
CULLMANN, Oliver Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 27 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
GEWEHR, Markus Goethestrasse 21 D-56288 Kastellaun / DE | 07 /
GRAMMENOS, Wassilios Borsigstrasse 5 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08 /
GYPSER, Andreas B 4.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 09 /
MÜLLER, Bernd Jean-Ganss-Strasse 21 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 10 /
PTOCK, Arne Eichenstrasse 23 D-67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 11 /
AMMERMANN, Eberhard Von-Gagern-Strasse 2 D-64646 Heppenheim / DE | 12 /
GROTE, Thomas Breslauer Strasse 6 D-67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 13 /
LORENZ, Gisela Erlenweg 13 D-67434 Neustadt / DE | 14 /
STRATHMANN, Siegfried Donnersbergstrasse 9 D-67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 15 /
HARRIES, Volker Immengärtenweg 29e D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2001/09] | Application number, filing date | 99924867.7 | 04.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999EP03003 | Priority number, date | DE1998121604 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821604 | [2001/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9959982 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077953 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/00 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
C07C251/60 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2001/09] | Title | German: | BISOXIMETHERDERIVATE, ZWISCHENPRODUKTE UND VERWENDUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON SCHADPILZEN UND TIERISCHEN SCHÄDLINGEN | [2001/09] | English: | BISOXIMETHER DERIVATIVES, METHODS AND INTERMEDIATE PRODUCTS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND THEIR USE FOR COMBATING FUNGICIDAL PESTS AND ANIMAL PESTS | [2001/09] | French: | DERIVES DE BISOXIMETHER, PROCEDES ET PRODUITS INTERMEDIAIRES POUR LEUR PREPARATION, AINSI QUE LEUR UTILISATION POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES PARASITES FONGIQUES ET LES PARASITES ANIMAUX | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9518789 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-9 * abstract ** claim 1 *; | [DX]WO9521153 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-21 * page 175, line 21 * * page 175, line 30 - line 43 * * page 177, line 20 - line 35 * * claims 3-14 *; | [DA]WO9705103 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * |