EP1080595 - MULTI-CELL TDMA RADIO COMMUNICATION THROUGH LIMITED SUBSETS OF TIME SLOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARAS, Philippe Videvägen 6 S-194 35 Upplands Väsby / SE | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus, et al Algemeen Octrooibureau, P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 99924874.3 | 29.04.1999 | [2001/10] | WO1999EP03034 | Priority number, date | EP19980201641 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98201641 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960808 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080595 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H04B7/26 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
H04W16/02 (EP,US);
H04B7/2643 (EP,US);
H04W16/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | MULTIZELLULARE TDMA FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DURCH REDUZIERTEN UNTERMENGEN VON ZEITSCHITZEN | [2001/10] | English: | MULTI-CELL TDMA RADIO COMMUNICATION THROUGH LIMITED SUBSETS OF TIME SLOTS | [2001/10] | French: | RADIOCOMMUNICATION AMRT A CELLULES MULTIPLES, PAR DES SOUS-ENSEMBLES LIMITES D'INTERVALLES DE TEMPS | [2001/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9713353 (OMNIPOINT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,9,22 * page 345, line 8 - line 18; figure - * [Y] 3; | [X]EP0662776 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,22 * page 2, column 2, line 44 - page 4, column 6, line 51; figure - *; | [YA]WO9317507 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 3 * page 12, line 26 - page 41, line 30; figure - * [A] 1,2,4-28; | [A]WO9641493 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-18 * page 14, line 16 - page 59, line 8; figure - *; | [A]WO9322849 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,22 * page 6, line 10 - page 14, line 22; figure - *; | [A]EP0444841 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,22 * page 3, column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 49; figure - *; | [A]WO9101073 (TELECOM SEC CELLULAR RADIO LTD [GB]) [A] 1,22 * page 3, line 9 - page 11, line 28; figure - *; | [A]WO9516332 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,22 * page 6, line 19 - page 13, line 6; figure - * |