EP1014595 - OPTICAL AMPLIFICATION RELAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGEMATSU, Masayuki, Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Masayuki, Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925374.3 | 18.06.1999 | [2000/26] | WO1999JP03261 | Priority number, date | JP19980180836 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: JP 18083698 | [2000/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001081 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014595 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/46, H04B10/08, H04B10/16, H04B10/17 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/2972 (EP,US);
H04B10/29 (KR);
H04B10/03 (EP,US);
H04B10/0775 (EP,US);
H04B10/0777 (EP,US);
H04B10/298 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | H04B3/46, H04B10/08, H04B10/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/26] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ZWISCHENVERSTÄRKERSYSTEM | [2000/26] | English: | OPTICAL AMPLIFICATION RELAY SYSTEM | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE RELAIS D'AMPLIFICATION OPTIQUE | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2000 | Translation filed | 10.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 02.05.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0993202 ; | [PX]US5875054 (ONODA YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09093202 A 19970404 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH05292083 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS62245826 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH07143078 (OI ELECTRIC, et al) |