EP1010444 - METHOD FOR EXECUTING GAME AND GAME MACHINE FOR IMPLEMENTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states SEGA CORPORATION 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda, 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKU, Tetsuya, Sega Enterprises, Ltd. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 144-8531 / JP | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/21] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2000/25] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925405.5 | 21.06.1999 | [2000/25] | WO1999JP03304 | Priority number, date | JP19980187667 | 02.07.1998 Original published format: JP 18766798 | [2000/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001454 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010444 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/00, A63F13/10 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
A63F13/426 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/55 (KR,US);
A63F13/52 (EP,KR);
A63F13/56 (EP,KR);
A63F13/833 (EP,KR);
A63F13/57 (EP,KR);
A63F13/822 (US);
A63F2300/64 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/6607 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | A63F9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPIELEN EINES SPIELS UND SPIELMASCHINE ZUM AUSFÜHREN DESGLEICHEN | [2000/25] | English: | METHOD FOR EXECUTING GAME AND GAME MACHINE FOR IMPLEMENTING THE SAME | [2000/25] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXECUTION D'UN JEU ET JEU ELECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT CETTE EXECUTION | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2000 | Translation filed | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10165647 ; | [Y]US5720663 (NAKATANI HAJIME [JP], et al) [Y] 3,6,9* column 11, line 39 - column 12, line 35 *; | [XY]WO9815329 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7 [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9; | EP0872266 [ ] (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [ ] * column 19, line 50 - column 20, line 15 *; | US6217446 [ ] (SANBONGI KAZUTOMO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 9, line 19 - line 55 * * figure 7 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10165647 A 19980623 (SEGA ENTERP LTD) [Y] 2,5,8 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH08131653 (NAMCO LTD); | [A]JPH09173635 (NAMCO LTD) |