EP1078180 - SELF-ALIGNING SEALING ASSEMBLY FOR A ROTATING SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dresser-Rand Company Baron Steuben Place Corning New York 14830 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states DRESSER-RAND COMPANY Baron Steuben Place Corning, New York 14830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGGOTT, John 1953 Riverview Drive Wellsville, NY 14895 / US | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925582.1 | 10.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999US10197 | Priority number, date | US19980078092 | 13.05.1998 Original published format: US 78092 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9958834 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1078180 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078180 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/447 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
F01D11/025 (EP,US);
F16J15/442 (EP,US);
F16J15/445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/09] | Title | German: | SELBSTEINSTELLENDE DICHTUNG FÜR EINE ROTORWELLE | [2001/09] | English: | SELF-ALIGNING SEALING ASSEMBLY FOR A ROTATING SHAFT | [2001/09] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE D'ETANCHEITE A AUTO-ALIGNEMENT POUR ARBRE TOURNANT | [2001/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 14.05.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 23.08.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IE | 10.05.2009 | LU | 10.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | GB | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.05.2009 | ||
LU | 10.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 10.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB227055 (MAURICE GEORGE PLANE, et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document *[Y] 9-14,16-18; | [XY]GB436139 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 9-14,16-18; | [XY]GB446836 (HORATIO CLARKE WALLWORK, et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 9-14,16-18 | International search | [Y]US2210543 (COX WILLIAM P); | [X]US3518020 (LAKE JOHN E); | [X]US3594010 (WARTH LAURENCE HUGO FREDERICK); | [Y]US3599990 (GREINER HAROLD FREDERIC, et al); | [X]US3979128 (GEARY CARL H); | [X]US3991588 (LASKARIS EVANGELOS T); | [X]US4012049 (LAMBRECHT DIETRICH, et al); | [X]US4411437 (CONTI ROGER C [US]); | [X]US4754983 (KRUGER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [X]US4998739 (WEILER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [X]US5603510 (SANDERS WILLIAM P [CA]) |