EP1082272 - CORROSION INHIBITING COMPOSITION FOR POLYACRYLIC ACID BASED BINDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo Ohio 43659 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Liang 7292 Halcyon Place New Albany, OH 43054 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Steven, H. 3901 Worthington Road Alexandria, OH 43001 / US | 03 /
AGRAWAL, Arun, K. 1872 Stockwell Drive Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 04 /
BRANNON, Kathryn, L. 112 Venetian Way Pataskala, OH 43062 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99925657.1 | 18.05.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999US10963 | Priority number, date | US19980087038P | 28.05.1998 Original published format: US 87038 P | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9961384 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082272 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082272 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/10 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/405 (EP,US);
C03C25/26 (EP,US);
C03C25/285 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/30 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F20/06 (US,EP);
C08K3/16, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
C08K3/30, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
C08K3/32, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
C08K5/053, C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/405, C08L33/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/11] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSINHIBIERENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR AUF POLYACRYLSÄURE BASIERTE BINDEMITTEL | [2001/11] | English: | CORROSION INHIBITING COMPOSITION FOR POLYACRYLIC ACID BASED BINDERS | [2001/11] | French: | COMPOSITION LIMITANT LA CORROSION POUR LIANTS A BASE D'ACIDE POLYACRYLIQUE | [2001/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS55140740 ; | [A]US3374200 (GEORGE DEICHERT WILLIAM) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [A]US4598119 (VOLK HENRY [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 11 *; | [DA]US5318990 (STRAUSS CARL R [US]) [DA] 1-10 * column W *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 51, Database accession no. 80-90988C, XP002114843 & JPS55140740 A 19801104 (DAI-ICHI KASEI KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |