EP1084132 - REDOX REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM COMPLEX CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics Corporation 9115 Hague Road Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCK, Harvey, B., Jr. 8147 Bay Brook Drive Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | 02 /
DENG, Zhi, D. 13722 Goldfinch Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Jung, Michael, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Jung, Michael, Dr., et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99925981.5 | 28.05.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999US11855 | Priority number, date | US19980087576P | 01.06.1998 Original published format: US 87576 P | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962918 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084132 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084132 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, G01N33/58, G01N33/72, C07K5/10, C07K14/805 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
C07F15/0026 (EP,US);
C07K14/805 (EP,US);
C07K5/101 (EP,US);
C07K7/02 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C07K9/001 (EP,US);
G01N27/3277 (EP,US);
G01N33/532 (EP,US);
G01N33/536 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/723 (EP,US);
G01N2333/805 (EP,US);
G01N2458/30 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US);
Y10S436/806 (EP,US);
Y10T436/105831 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | REDOX-REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOL-OSMIUMKOMPLEX-KONJUGATE | [2001/12] | English: | REDOX REVERSIBLE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM COMPLEX CONJUGATES | [2001/12] | French: | CONJUGUES D'UN COMPLEXE IMIDAZOLE-OSMIUM A OXYDO-REDUCTION REVERSIBLE | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.07.2002 | BE | 24.07.2002 | CH | 24.07.2002 | FI | 24.07.2002 | GR | 24.07.2002 | LI | 24.07.2002 | NL | 24.07.2002 | DK | 24.10.2002 | SE | 24.10.2002 | PT | 29.10.2002 | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
DK | 24.10.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 29.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 24.07.2002 | |
CH | 24.07.2002 | ||
FI | 24.07.2002 | ||
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
LI | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 29.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
PT | 29.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
GR | 24.07.2002 | ||
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 24.07.2002 | |
NL | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | NL | 24.07.2002 | |
SE | 24.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 24.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4945045 (FORREST GORDON C [GB], et al) [DA] 1,8,10-17 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9325907 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1,8,10-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9414066 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,10-17 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE4344646 (SCHELLER FRIEDER PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1,8,10-17 * example 1 *; | [DXA]US5589326 (DENG ZHI D [US], et al) [DX] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-13; | [A]WO9701097 (SEREX INC [US]) [A] 1,8,10-17 * example 3 *; | [A] - A J NIELSON, W P GRIFFITH, "Reactions of Osmium Tetroxide with Protein Side Chains and Unsaturated Lipids", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (1979), pages 1084 - 1088, XP002114931 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |