EP1072077 - LOAD FEEDER WITH INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/05] | INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION MODULE | ||
[2001/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states Murrelektronik GmbH Falkenstrasse 3 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Murrelektronik GmbH Falkenstrasse 3 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBHARD, Josef Talweg 22 D-92224 Amberg / DE | 02 /
HERNES, Klaus Asamstrasse 12 D-92266 Ensdorf / DE | 03 /
ZIMMERMANN, Norbert Lobenhofstrasse 19 D-92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 04 /
ZIZLER, Josef Lohweg 2 D-92272 Freudenberg / DE | 05 /
LAIBLE, Helmut Fritz-Ehrmann-Strasse 26 D-71570 Murrhardt / DE | 06 /
FRANK, Herbert Hofackerweg 10 D-71570 Oppenweiler / DE | 07 /
ARNOLD, Pius Im Kästelein 4 D-96158 Frensdorf / DE | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/05] | Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99926246.2 | 14.04.1999 | [2001/05] | WO1999DE01128 | Priority number, date | DE1998117231 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19817231 | [2001/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9954980 | Date: | 28.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072077 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072077 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, H01H71/02, H01H50/02 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
H01H50/021 (EP);
H01H71/0228 (EP);
H02H9/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/05] |
Former [2001/05] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | VERBRAUCHERABZWEIG MIT ENTSTÖRMODUL | [2001/32] | English: | LOAD FEEDER WITH INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION MODULE | [2001/32] | French: | ALIMENTATION D'UNE CHARGE AVEC MODULE ANTIPARASITES | [2001/32] |
Former [2001/05] | ENTSTÖRMODUL | ||
Former [2001/05] | INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION MODULE | ||
Former [2001/05] | MODULE ANTIPARASITES | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5606299 (INNES MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column W * [Y] 6; | [Y]DE8906072U (TELEMECANIQUE) [Y] 6 * abstract * |