EP1006848 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING COFFEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strauss, Rolf-Peter Schräling 54a 35066 Frankenberg / DE | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/24] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Hössle & Kudlek, Holzstrasse 26 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99926377.5 | 24.05.1999 | [2000/24] | WO1999EP03548 | Priority number, date | DE1998123546 | 27.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823546 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960900 | Date: | 02.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006848 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006848 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/00, A47J31/06, A47J31/04 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A47J31/0657 (EP);
A47J31/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON KAFFEE | [2000/24] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING COFFEE | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PREPARER DU CAFE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.09.2002 | GB | 25.09.2002 | IT | 25.09.2002 | NL | 25.09.2002 | SE | 25.12.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | AT | 24.05.2003 | CH | 31.05.2003 | LI | 31.05.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 25.09.2002 | |
GB | 25.09.2002 | ||
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
AT | 24.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/43] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
AT | 24.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 25.09.2002 | |
NL | 25.09.2002 | ||
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | NL | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 25.09.2002 | |
SE | 25.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 25.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2862440 (OAKES GLADYS J) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 71 - column 4, line 29 * * column 6, line 53 - line 62; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6-8,10; | [XA]GB956109 (HUGO PATZNER) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 76; figure - * [A] 8; | [XA]US4858523 (HELBLING EDWARD [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 28 - column 7, line 11; figures 1,7,8 * [A] 6-8; | [X]DE3935384 (KEUSCH SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 59; figure - *; | [A]US5063838 (MATUSCHEK MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1,2* column 6, line 58 - column 15, line 63; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [Y]US5165327 (FERRARA JR DANIEL R [US]) [Y] 6-8,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 21; figures 2,7 *; | [XA]WO9511613 (NUOVA FAEMA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 16, paragraph L - page 37, paragraph 1; figures 1,4 * [A] 7,8 |