EP1092266 - A TUNABLE DIGITAL OSCILLATOR CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CLOCK SIGNALS OF DIFFERENT FREQUENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S3 Incorporated 2801 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara California 95052-8058 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states S3 Incorporated 2801 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, California 95052-8058 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURMAN, Elliot 854 Coleman Avenue Q Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler, Käck, Fiener et Col. Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927122.4 | 28.05.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999US12071 | Priority number, date | US19980088645 | 01.06.1998 Original published format: US 88645 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9963665 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092266 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/13 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
H03K3/03 (EP,US);
H03K5/131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/16] | Title | German: | DIGITALE ABSTIMMBARE OSZILLATORSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TAKTSIGNALEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN FREQUENZEN | [2001/16] | English: | A TUNABLE DIGITAL OSCILLATOR CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING CLOCK SIGNALS OF DIFFERENT FREQUENCIES | [2001/16] | French: | CIRCUIT D'OSCILLATEUR NUMERIQUE ACCORDABLE ET PROCEDE DE GENERATION DE SIGNAUX D'HORLOGE DE DIFFERENTES FREQUENCES | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 05.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5568075 (CURRAN BRIAN W [US], et al); | [A]US5003194 (ENGELHARD HOLGER [DE]); | [A]US5656961 (TRAN THANH THIEN [US], et al) |