EP1086199 - ADHESIVE SANITARY AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buck-Chemie GmbH . Hertzstrasse 71083 Herrenberg / DE | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETTINGER, Johannes Panoramastrasse 51/1 D-71260 Horb / DE | 02 /
JAESCHKE, Edgar Ludwig-Richter-Weg 14 D-70794 Filderstadt / DE | 03 /
SEIDEL, Detlef Blienshaldenweg 74 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Mammel, Ulrike Mammel & Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Mammel, Ulrike Mammel & Maser Patent- und Markenanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
Former [2001/13] | Mammel, Ulrike, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Kinkelin, Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte Weimarer Strasse 32/34 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99927871.6 | 04.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999EP03866 | Priority number, date | DE1998126293 | 12.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19826293 | [2001/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966017 | Date: | 23.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086199 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086199 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22, C11D17/00, C11D1/94, C11D3/37 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
C11D3/2013 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (EP,US);
C11D17/0043 (EP,US);
C11D3/18 (EP,US);
C11D3/2079 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/3746 (EP,US);
C11D3/3776 (EP,US);
C11D3/48 (EP,US);
A61L2/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | HAFTENDES SANITÄRMITTEL | [2001/13] | English: | ADHESIVE SANITARY AGENT | [2001/13] | French: | PRODUIT D'ASSAINISSEMENT ADHESIF | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 11.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.05.2002 | DK | 29.08.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/20] | GR | 29.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3578499 (CROTTY HOMER E, et al) [A] 1,2,8,10,11 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 25 *; | [A]CA1151501 (TASTAYRE GILLES M) [A] 1-3,8,9,11 * page 3, line 18 - line 23; example - *; | [A]EP0589761 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,2,8,10,11 * page 2, line 3 - line 9 * * page 3, line 6 - line 21; example - *; | [X]WO9518209 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-11 * page 1, line 9 - line 12 * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 3 * * tables I,II *; | [A]WO9521239 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,11* page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 4 *; | [A]US5460742 (CAVANAGH JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,10,11 * column 1, line 35 - line 59 * * claim -; table II *; | [A]WO9704061 (YANKEE POLISH LUETH GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 6 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 4 - line 24 *; | [A]WO9740133 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,2,8,10,11 * page 1, line 4 - line 12 * * example 1; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO9846712 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PX] 1,2,8,10,11 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 6, line 5 - line 15 * * example -; claims 1,2,13 * |