EP1090156 - TREATMENT OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY MELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINIUM RHEINFELDEN GmbH Friedrichstrasse 80 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Hubert Werthstrasse 16 D-79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99928168.6 | 21.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999IB01260 | Priority number, date | EP19980810594 | 26.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98810594 | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0000654 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090156 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090156 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/06, C22C1/02, B22D21/04 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
C22C21/06 (EP,US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSSCHMELZE | [2001/15] | English: | TREATMENT OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY MELT | [2001/15] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'UNE MASSE FONDUE D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH07197177 ; | [A]DE2658308 (ALUSUISSE)[A] 1-6; | [XA]EP0110190 (ITALIA ALLUMINIO [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5 *Beispiele* [A] 3,6; | [XA]EP0594509 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 *Tabelle 1 und 2, Beispiele 2,4,11,13,15,17; Seite 3, Zeile 4-20* [A] 2-4,6; | [XA]US5540791 (MATSUO MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 *Spalte 3, Zeile 2-6; Spalte 4, Zeile 14-40; Tabelle 1, Beispiel 3*;; table 1 * [A] 6 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, & JP07197177 A 19950801 (SKY ALUM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * [A] 3,4,6 |