EP1117531 - COMPOSITE ARTICLES INCLUDING A FLUOROPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states DYNEON LLC 6744 Upper 33rd Street North Oakdale, Minnesota 55128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARSONAGE, Edward, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MOLNAR, Attila P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
BLONG, Thomas, J. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
KOLB, Robert, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99928576.0 | 10.06.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US13206 | Priority number, date | US19980094668P | 30.07.1998 Original published format: US 94668 P | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006376 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117531 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, C08J5/12 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (KR,US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (EP,US);
C08J5/121 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31544 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31576 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31732 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/30] | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE DIE EIN FLUORPOLYMER ENTHALTEN | [2001/30] | English: | COMPOSITE ARTICLES INCLUDING A FLUOROPOLYMER | [2001/30] | French: | ARTICLES COMPOSITES CONTENANT UN FLUOROPOLYMERE | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO9932557 (DYNEON LLC [US]) [E] 1,3,6,7,13 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 30 * * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 10 * * page 12, line 1 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0739712 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9900249 (DYNEON LLC [US]) [PA] 1-15 * claim - * |