EP1092286 - PN CODE SELECTION FOR SYNCHRONOUS CDMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-3 Communications Corporation 600 Third Avenue New York, N.Y. 10016 / US | [2001/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIECZYPOROWICZ, Leon 7531 S. Spring Drive W. Jordan, UT 84084 / US | 02 /
GIALLORENZI, Thomas 7794 W. Mountain Top Road Herriman, UT 84065 / US | 03 /
PERKINS, Steven, B. 10789 Heather Ridge Drive Sandy, UT 84070 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99928607.3 | 11.06.1999 | [2001/16] | WO1999US13290 | Priority number, date | US19980091070P | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 91070 P | US19990328546 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: US 328546 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001091 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092286 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/216, H04B15/00 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
H04J13/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04J13/0022 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/707 (KR);
H04B7/2628 (KR);
H04J13/10 (KR);
H04B2201/70719 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | PN KODENWAHL FÜR SYNCHRONES CDMA | [2001/16] | English: | PN CODE SELECTION FOR SYNCHRONOUS CDMA | [2001/16] | French: | SELECTION D'UN CODE DE PSEUDO-BRUIT POUR AMCR SYNCHRONE | [2001/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 31.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5151919 (DENT PAUL W [SE]); | [A]US5751761 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US]); | [AE]US5936972 (MEIDAN REUVEN [IL], et al) |