EP1198734 - DEVICE FOR DISPLACING 3-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS IN THE PROJECTION AREA OF A PROJECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EA Entertainment GMBH Mörikestrasse 1 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERHAHN-WUNDERLICH, Peter Possweg 39 D-14163 Berlin / DE | [2004/06] |
Former [2002/17] | 01 /
WEWRHAHN-WUNDERLICH, Peter Possweg 39 D-14163 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/45] |
Former [2002/17] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929317.8 | 25.06.1999 | [2002/17] | WO1999EP04422 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101194 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198734 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G03B15/10, A63J5/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A63J5/021 (EP,US);
G03B15/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN 3-DIMENSIONALER GEGENSTÄNDE IM PROJEKTIONSRAUM EINES PROJEKTIONSSYSTEMS | [2002/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPLACING 3-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS IN THE PROJECTION AREA OF A PROJECTION SYSTEM | [2002/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DEPLACER DES OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS DANS LA SALLE DE PROJECTION D'UN SYSTEME DE PROJECTION | [2002/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 13.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | 13.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.03.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 25.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2002 | 30.06.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2002 | 01.12.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 24.07.2003 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2004/38] | 01.12.2004 | Resumption of proceedings | [2004/38] | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0427864 (TEATR POLIFONICHESKOI DRAMY [SU]) [DA] 1-17 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5573325 (LEKOWSKI ANDREW J [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]US3754756 (SZIGETY P) [A] 1,9 * figures 1,3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0737879 (LETTNER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |