EP1098848 - Method for preparing a dispersible aluminium hydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/20] | NOVEL DISPERSIBLE ALUMINIUM HYDRATE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND USE FOR PREPARING CATALYSTS | ||
[2011/45] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states IFP Energies Nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE GOFF, Pierre-Yves 20-24, rue de la Plaine F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
LAVAL, Philippe 162 B, rue Ordener F-75018 Paris / FR | 03 /
MARTIN, Michel 47, rue Masséna F-69006 Lyon / FR | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/13] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/51] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/20] | Andreeff, François INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 99929417.6 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999FR01632 | Priority number, date | FR19980008609 | 06.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9808609 | FR19990004862 | 16.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904862 | [2001/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001617 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098848 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098848 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1098848 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/02, C01F7/14, C01F7/34, B01J21/04, B01J35/10 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
C01F7/141 (EP,US);
C01F7/34 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
C01F7/02 (EP,US);
B01J21/02 (KR);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, NL [2003/42] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines dispergierbares aAuminiumhydrat | [2011/45] | English: | Method for preparing a dispersible aluminium hydrate | [2011/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un hydrate d'aluminium dispersible | [2012/22] |
Former [2001/20] | NEUES DISPERGIERBARES ALUMINIUMHYDRAT, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KATALYSATOREN | ||
Former [2001/20] | NOVEL DISPERSIBLE ALUMINIUM HYDRATE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME AND USE FOR PREPARING CATALYSTS | ||
Former [2001/20] | NOUVEL HYDRATE D'ALUMINIUM DISPERSIBLE, SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET SON UTILISATION POUR LA PREPARATION DE CATALYSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2004
22.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Derks, Wilbert Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2004
22.07.2004
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Derks, Wilbert Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 NL-1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2004/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.07.2004
Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 19.08.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.09.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.06.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.2006 | Appeal received No. T0517/06 | 22.06.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.07.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 21.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3864461 (MILLER ARTHUR WILLIAM, et al) [A] 7-9 * column W *; | [X]US4120943 (IWAISAKO TOSHIYUKI, et al) [X] 1-3,15,16 * column 3, line 5 - line 21 *; | [A]US4332782 (SCHERZER JULIUS, et al) [A] 7-9; | [X]US4371513 (SANCHEZ MOISES G, et al) [X] 10-16 * column W *; | [A]DE3243193 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 7-9 * claims 2,3 *; | [A]EP0324936 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 15,16* the whole document *; | [X]EP0505896 (NORTON CO [US]) [X] 1-5,15,16 * claims 1,7; table 1 *; | [X]WO9512547 (RWE DEA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,15,16 * tables 1,2 * | Opposition | GB1308316 | JPS5717425 | US4313923 | US4676928 | US4762684 | US5194243 | - G. MARTINO, Declaration under Rule 37 CFR § 1132 |