EP1097509 - VECTORIAL MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commisariat à l'énergie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris 15ème / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states Commisariat à l'énergie Atomique 31-33, Rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris 15ème / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSAT, Jean 47, rue de Boussy F-91860 Epinay sous Senart / FR | 02 /
FEL, Nicolas 6, rue Robert Farer F-94700 Maisons Alfort / FR | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/19] | Des Termes, Monique Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99929440.8 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999FR01660 | Priority number, date | FR19980008918 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9808918 | [2001/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0003475 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097509 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097509 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03C1/60 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H03C1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | VEKTORMODULATOR | [2001/19] | English: | VECTORIAL MODULATOR | [2001/19] | French: | MODULATEUR VECTORIEL | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | IE | 08.05.2002 | LU | 08.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | MC | 01.02.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
LU | 08.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
LU | 08.07.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
IE | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3411110 (WALKER WINSTON G) [A] 2 * column 1, line 25 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2064246 (MARCONI CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 24 - line 107; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2240890 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]); | [A]US5631610 (SANDBERG STUART [US], et al); | [A] - P. HAWKER, "TECHNICAL TOPICS", RADIO COMMUNICATION, (197312), pages 852 - 857, XP002097316 [A] 1 * page 852, column 1, line 15 - page 853, column 2, line 25; figures 1,2 * |