EP1098173 - DISK-MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR OPTICAL ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | ||
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Yoshihiro K. K. Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
TASHIRO, Kazuo K. K. Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929758.3 | 08.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999JP03698 | Priority number, date | JP19980195533 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: JP 19553398 | [2001/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0003203 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098173 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098173 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34, G01D5/347 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/34707 (EP,US);
G01D5/32 (KR);
G01D5/3473 (EP,US);
G01D5/34738 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/19] | G01D5/34, G01D5/245 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2005/27] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SCHEIBE EINER OPTISCHEN KODIERVORRICHTUNG | [2001/19] | English: | DISK-MOUNTING STRUCTURE FOR OPTICAL ENCODER | [2001/19] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE DE DISQUE POUR CODEUR OPTIQUE | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2000 | Translation filed | 22.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 01.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4740691 (USHIYAMA SHIGEYUKI [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0559237U ; | [A]JPH0738918U ; | [A]JPH08159807 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) |