EP1195400 - CROSSLINKABLE ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, SEALING MATERIAL PRODUCED FROM THE COMPOSITION, AND FILLER FOR USE THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Masanori Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
NOGUCHI, Tsuyoshi Yodogawa-seisakusho Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99929827.6 | 14.07.1999 | [2002/15] | WO1999JP03793 | Priority number, date | JP19980204065 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20406598 | [2002/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004083 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195400 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08K9/00, C08K5/14, C08L21/00, C08L27/12, C08L83/04, C08L101/00, C08K9/02, C08K9/04 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/24 (KR);
C08K3/011 (KR);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K5/14 (KR);
C08K9/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/15] | Title | German: | VERNETZBARE ELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DICHTUNGSMATERIAL HERGESTELLT AUS DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FÜLLSTOFF ZUR VERWENDUNG DARIN | [2002/15] | English: | CROSSLINKABLE ELASTOMER COMPOSITION, SEALING MATERIAL PRODUCED FROM THE COMPOSITION, AND FILLER FOR USE THEREIN | [2002/15] | French: | COMPOSITION ELASTOMERE RETICULABLE, MATIERE D'ETANCHEITE OBTENU A PARTIR DE LA COMPOSITION, ET MATIERE DE CHARGE UTILISABLE DANS LADITE COMPOSITION | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2001 | Translation filed | 15.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.02.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 03.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02311567 ; | [X]US4472336 (ENOKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * examples 3,7-10,12; claims 1-6; tables 1-3,5,6 *; | [X]WO9502634 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 6-11* examples C.EX.A,C.EX.B; claims 1,10; tables II,III,IV *; | [E]EP1106268 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,6-11 * page 17; examples A,B; table 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910311), vol. 015, no. 100, Database accession no. (C - 0813), & JP02311567 A 19901227 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5140153 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al); | [A]JPS57172555 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS61283659 (TOKAI CARBON KK); | [A]JPH01213362 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) |