EP1089750 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING BONE RESORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states MERCK & CO., INC. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESZKA, Alfred, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Hiscock, Ian James European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99930491.8 | 21.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US13961 | Priority number, date | US19980090497P | 24.06.1998 Original published format: US 90497 P | US19980092917P | 15.07.1998 Original published format: US 92917 P | GB19980017170 | 06.08.1998 Original published format: GB 9817170 | GB19980019126 | 02.09.1998 Original published format: GB 9819126 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9966945 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1089750 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/07, A61K31/66, C07K5/00, A61K38/08 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/07 (EP);
A61K38/06 (EP);
A61K38/55 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
C07K5/0827 (EP);
C07K5/1027 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/07, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/55, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | A61K38/00, A61K38/07, A61K31/66, C07K5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Extension states | AL | 24.01.2001 | LT | 24.01.2001 | LV | 24.01.2001 | MK | 24.01.2001 | RO | 24.01.2001 | SI | 24.01.2001 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR INHIBIERUNG VON KNOCHENRESORPTION. | [2001/15] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING BONE RESORPTION | [2001/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'INHIBER LA RESORPTION D'UN OS | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 12.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HAMILTON R ET AL, "Synthesis and proteinase inhibitory properties of diphenyl phosphonate analogues of aspartic and glutamic acids", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19980707), vol. 8, no. 13, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1655 - 1660, XP004137102 [A] 1-20 * see abstract and introduction, second paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00272-8 | International search | [XP] - COXON F P, ET AL., "PROTEIN SYNTHESIS IS REQUIRED FOR CASPASE ACTIVATION AND INDUCTION OF APOPTOSIS BY BISPHOSPHONATE DRUGS", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, American Society for Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, US, US, (19981001), vol. 54, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 631 - 638, XP002924478 | [A] - TAN P L J, ET AL., "AMINOBISPHOSPHONATE INHIBITION OF INTERLEUKIN-1-INDUCED BONE RESORPTION IN MOUSE CALVARIAE", Arthritis & Rheumatism, Wiley, US, US, (19880601), vol. 31, no. 06, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 762 - 768, XP002924479 | [A] - NICHOLSON D W, THORNBERRY N A, "CASPASES: KILLER PROTEASES", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES., ELSEVIER, HAYWARDS., GB, GB, (19970801), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/S0968-0004(97)01085-2, ISSN 0968-0004, pages 299 - 306, XP002924480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0004(97)01085-2 | [A] - SANDERS J L, ET AL., "ALENDRONATE/INTERLEUKIN-1BETA COTREATMENT INCREASES INTERLEUKIN-6 IN BONE AND UMR-106 CELLS: DOSE DEPENDENCE AND RELATIONSHIP TO THE ANTIRESORPTIVE EFFECT OF ALENDRONATE", Journal of Bone and Mineral Research, Blackwell Science, Inc., US, US, (19980101), vol. 13, no. 05, doi:10.1359/jbmr.1998.13.5.786, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 786 - 792, XP002924481 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.1998.13.5.786 | [A] - HUGHES D E, ET AL., "BISPHOSPHONATES PROMOTE APOPTOSIS IN MURINE OSTEOCLASTS IN VITRO AND IN VIVO", Journal of Bone and Mineral Research, Blackwell Science, Inc., US, US, (19950101), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 1478 - 1487, XP002924482 |