EP1090337 - A SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF A CONTINUOUS POLYMERIZATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, David, Hamel 131 North Main Street Woodstown, NJ 08098-1225 / US | 02 /
CARVER, Kirk, Demler 6075 Barrington Avenue Beaumont, TX 77706 / US | 03 /
COON, Richard, Monroe 4324 Tulane Port Arthur, TX 77642 / US | 04 /
SANDELL, David, Jack 4690 Reagan Street Beaumont, TX 77706-7466 / US | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1830 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Veldhuizen, Albert Dirk Willem, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99930846.3 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/15] | WO1999US14879 | Priority number, date | US19980106677 | 29.06.1998 Original published format: US 106677 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0000875 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090337 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/00, B01J8/18, C08F2/34, B01J8/24, B01J19/00, G05D23/13, C08F10/00 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
B01J8/1809 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/1836 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
G05D23/1393 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2208/00044 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2208/00256 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00274 (EP,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0022 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00225 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00238 (EP,US);
Y10S526/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | G05D23/00, B01J8/18, C08F2/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG DER TEMPERATUR EINES VERFAHRENS ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN POLYMERISATION | [2001/15] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING TEMPERATURE OF A CONTINUOUS POLYMERIZATION PROCESS | [2001/15] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION THERMIQUE D'UN PROCESSUS DE POLYMERISATION CONTINUE | [2001/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 24.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0516036 (NESTE OY [FI]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 7 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 30 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US3994164 (REGENASS WILLY, et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0824116 (BP CHEMICALS SNC [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 1 * * column 12, line 19 - column 13, line 4 * | International search | [Y]US4588790 (JENKINS III JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y]US5608019 (CHERUVU SUBRAHMANYAM [US], et al) |