EP1097465 - PHOTODETECTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PerkinElmer Optoelectronics GmbH Wenzel-Jaksch-Strasse 31 65199 Wiesbaden / DE | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARDEN, Raimund Bischof-Dirichs-Strasse 13 b D-65375 Oestrich-Winkel / DE | 02 /
SIMONETTI, John, J. 1 Line Road Hamilton Square, NJ 08690 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931181.4 | 25.06.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999EP04420 | Priority number, date | US19980116520 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: US 116520 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004567 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097465 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097465 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/28, H01J43/24, H01J43/04 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H01J43/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FI, FR, GB [2001/19] | Title | German: | PHOTODETEKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2001/19] | English: | PHOTODETECTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT | [2001/19] | French: | PHOTODETECTEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.08.2010 | [2011/27] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3243628 (MATHESON ROBERT M) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 23 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0401879 (K & M ELECTRONICS CO [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * column 4, lines 14-55 ** figures 1-4 * |