EP1018166 - Method for producing a photovoltaic module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/28] | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2004/17] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOVOLTAIC AG Isovoltaicstrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states ISOVOLTAIC AG Isovoltastrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states ISOVOLTAIC GmbH Isovoltastrasse 1 8403 Lebring / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | |||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | |||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states ISOVOLTA Österreichische Isolierstoffwerke Aktiengesellschaft Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd 2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLESSING, Albert 8302 Brunn 28 / AT | 02 /
LANGOWSKI, Horst-Christian Schlossstrasse 24a D-85406 Zolling / DE | 03 /
MOOSHEIMER, Ulrich Pfarrstrasse 2 D-85411 Hohenkammer / DE | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2013/21] |
Former [2000/28] | Dungler, Karin, et al c/o Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Postfach 264 1071 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99931217.6 | 30.06.1999 | [2000/28] | WO1999EP04505 | Priority number, date | EP19980112319 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98112319 | [2000/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002257 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018166 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018166 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, H01L31/18, B32B31/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
B32B3/08 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B39/00 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2307/40 (US);
B32B2457/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2000/28] | H01L31/048, B32B31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Extension states | AL | 02.03.2000 | LT | 02.03.2000 | LV | 02.03.2000 | MK | 02.03.2000 | RO | 02.03.2000 | SI | 02.03.2000 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines fotovoltaischen Moduls | [2004/17] | English: | Method for producing a photovoltaic module | [2004/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un module photovoltaique | [2004/17] |
Former [2000/28] | FOTOVOLTAISCHER MODUL SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2000/28] | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2000/28] | MODULE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 20.10.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 28.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome, Otsu Shiga 520-8558 / JP Opponent's representative Kador, Utz Ulrich Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2005
ADMISSIBLE Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Sonoyama 1-chome, Otsu Shiga 520-8558 / JP Opponent's representative Kador, Ulrich Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | 08.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.02.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 21.02.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/24] | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 12.06.2008 | Appeal received No. T1115/08 | 08.08.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.02.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 21.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.03.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | CY | 30.06.2012 | FI | 30.06.2012 | IE | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | SE | 01.07.2012 | DK | 02.07.2012 | NL | 01.01.2013 | PT | 02.01.2013 | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/28] | BE | 30.06.2012 | |
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
CY | 30.06.2012 | ||
FI | 30.06.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
SE | 01.07.2012 | ||
NL | 01.01.2013 | ||
PT | 02.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0774378 ; | [A]JPH1025357 ; | [A]US4433200 (JESTER THERESA L [US], et al); | [A]WO9206847 (UNITED SOLAR SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | [DY]WO9429106 (ISOVOLTA [AT], et al) [DY] 1,4,7,9,10,13 * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 13; figures 1,2; claims 1,2,6,7,9 *; | [XY]DE19611410 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-3; claims 1-3 * [Y] 1,7,9,10,13; | [XY]WO9736334 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-4 * * page 13, lines 15-25; claims 1-3,7-9,11 * [Y] 1,4,7,9,10,13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07074378 A 19950317 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [A] 1,2,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 098, no. 005, & JP10025357 A 19980127 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |