EP1102806 - METHOD OF COATING PRE-PRIMED POLYOLEFIN FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Treofan Germany GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Treofan Germany GmbH & Co.KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Trespaphan GmbH & Co. KG Am Prime Parc 10-12 65479 Raunheim / DE | ||
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Hoechst Trespaphan GmbH Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen-Wellesweiler / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABED, Jean-Claude 9323 Forest Drive Charlotte, NC 28270 / US | 02 /
FURR, Bobby, N. 10915 Caroline Acres Fort Mill, SC 29715 / US | 03 /
BONSALL, Bettina, E. 68 Harry Road Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
HOLCOMB, Douglas, R. 37 Church Street South Orange, NJ 07079 / US | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/01] |
Former [2001/22] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931259.8 | 07.07.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999EP04778 | Priority number, date | US19980112730 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: US 112730 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002956 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102806 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102806 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C09D1/02, // C08L23:02 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
C09D1/02 (EP,US);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C08J7/052 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3192 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON VORGRUNDIERTEN POLYOLEFINFOLIEN | [2001/22] | English: | METHOD OF COATING PRE-PRIMED POLYOLEFIN FILMS | [2001/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT DE FILMS DE POLYOLEFINES PREALABLEMENT RECOUVERTS D'UNE COUCHE PRIMAIRE | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2004 | Decision despatched | 20.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.10.2006 | FI | 18.10.2006 | NL | 18.10.2006 | DK | 18.01.2007 | SE | 18.01.2007 | GR | 19.01.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | IE | 09.07.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/45] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
IE | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
GR | 19.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
DK | 18.01.2007 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 18.10.2006 | |
NL | 18.10.2006 | ||
SE | 18.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | NL | 18.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5545375 (TROPSHA YELENA G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-17; | [X]EP0787825 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * claims 1,4,5,8 ** example 1 *; | [Y]WO9747678 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-34 * |