EP1095304 - MULTIPLEXER FOR LASER LITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2004/14] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 16750 Via del Campo Court San Diego, CA 92127-1712 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZARSKI, Robert, G. 13894 Lake Poway Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
ERSHOV, Alexander I. 11312 Meadow Flower Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99931850.4 | 22.06.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US14003 | Priority number, date | US19980112631 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: US 112631 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0003284 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095304 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, G03F7/20 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
G02B26/08 (KR);
G03F7/7005 (EP,US);
G03F7/70991 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/18] | G02B26/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/18] | Title | German: | MULTIPLEXER FÜR LASER-LITHOGRAPHE | [2001/18] | English: | MULTIPLEXER FOR LASER LITHOGRAPHY | [2001/18] | French: | MULTIPLEXEUR POUR LITHOGRAPHIE AU LASER | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 03.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5091744 (OMATA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 6 * * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 2 *; | [A]JPH07312342 ; | [A]US5036042 (HED AHARON Z [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 5 * * column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 18 *; | [A]JPS6175523 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07312342 A 19951128 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860822), vol. 010, no. 244, Database accession no. (E - 430), & JP61075523 A 19860417 (CANON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * | International search | [AP]US5880817 (HASHIMOTO SUMIO [JP]); | [A]US5036042 (HED AHARON Z [US]); | [A]US5576901 (HANCHETT NEVILLE [US]); | [A]US3993402 (FREDRICK JR WILLIAM G) |