EP1093379 - USE OF INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN KINASE C EPSILON TO TREAT PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Messing, Robert O. 960 Swan Street Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
For all designated states Levine, Jon D. 791 12th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messing, Robert O. 960 Swan Stret Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
Levine, Jon D. 791 12th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94118 / US | [2003/25] |
Former [2001/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99932296.9 | 06.07.1999 | [2001/17] | WO1999US15265 | Priority number, date | US19980091755P | 06.07.1998 Original published format: US 91755 P | US19980103763P | 09.10.1998 Original published format: US 103763 P | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0001415 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093379 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093379 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K38/00, A61K38/08, A61P29/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61K38/45 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C12Q1/485 (EP);
G01N2500/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/45, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG DER PROTEIN-KINASE-C-EPSILON-INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN | [2001/17] | English: | USE OF INHIBITORS OF PROTEIN KINASE C EPSILON TO TREAT PAIN | [2001/17] | French: | UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE KINASE C EPSILON DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Request for further processing for: | 23.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 23.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2007 | BE | 03.01.2007 | CH | 03.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | LI | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | LU | 06.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9715575 (PROCYON PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,3-6,12,13 * page 19, line 7 * * page 38, lines 26-30; example 17 * * page 39; example 18 *; | [PDA]US5783405 (MOCHLY-ROSEN DARIA [US], et al) [PDA] 1-7,10-14; | [PX] - CESARE P ET AL, "Specific involvement of PKC-epsilon in sensitization of the neuronal response to painful heat.", NEURON, JUL 1999, 23 (3) P617-24, UNITED STATES, XP000869683 [PX] 1-7,10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(00)80813-2 | [T] - KHASAR, S. G. ET AL, "A novel nociceptor signalling pathway revealed in Protein Kinase C epsilon mutant mice", NEURON, (199909), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 253 - 260, XP000869769 [T] 1-7,10-14 * the whole document * * especially page 257, righthand column, line 9-20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(00)80837-5 | [T] - KHASAR, S.G. ET AL, "Epinephrine produces a beta-adrenergic receptor mediated mechanical hyperalgesia and in vitro sensitization of rat nociceptors", JOURNAL OF NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, (199903), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 1104 - 11112, XP000869664 [T] 1-7,10-14 * the whole document * | [DY] - HUNDLE, B. ET AL, "An inhibitory fragment derived from Protein Kinase C epsilon prevents enhancement of Nerve Growth Factor responses by ethanol and phorbol esters", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, no. 23, pages 15028 - 15035, XP002119149 [DY] 1-7,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.23.15028 | [Y] - HUNDLE, B. ET AL, "Overexpression of epsilon-Protein kinase C enhances Nerve Growth Factor-induced phosphorylation of mitogen-activated protein kinases and neurite outgrowth", THE JOURNAL OF BIOOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 50, pages 30134 - 30140, XP000867400 [Y] 1-7,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.50.30134 | [Y] - LEWIN, G.R. ET AL, "Nerve growth factor and nociception", TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCE, (1993), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 353 - 359, XP000870184 [Y] 1-7,12-14 * page 355, column L, line 65 - page 358, column R, line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-2236(93)90092-Z | [Y] - LEWIN, G.R. ET AL, "Nerve growth factor-induced hyperalgesia in the neonatal and adult rat", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1993), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 2136 - 2148, XP000870190 [Y] 1-7,12-14 * the whole document * | [DA] - JOHNSON, J. A. ET AL, "A Protein Kinase C translocation inhibitor as an isozyme-selective antagonist of cardiac function", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 271, no. 40, pages 24962 - 66, XP000867211 [DA] 3,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.40.24962 | [X] - HATTORI, KIYOSHI, "Role of spinal N-type Ca channels and protein kinase C activities in modulating hyperalgesia. Determination of spinal amino acid release and pain related response", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002129369 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * abstract * | [ ] - KYUSHU SHIKA GAKKAI ZASSHI, (1996), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 789 - 806 | [X] - MAO, JIANREN, "Excitatory central mechanisms of post-injury neuropathic pain", DISSERTATION ABSTRACTS, UMI, XP002129370 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * abstract * | [ ] - DISSERTATION ABSTRACTS INTERNATIONAL, (1992), vol. 53, no. 04-B, page 1726 | [X] - SLUKA K.A. ET AL, "Capsaicin-induced sensitization of primate spinothalamic tract cells is prevented by a protein kinase C inhibitor", BRAIN RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 772, no. 1-2, pages 82 - 86, XP000869915 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(97)00876-7 | [DX] - AHLGREN, S.C. ET AL, "Protein Kinase C inhibitors decrease hyperalgesia and C-fiber hyperexcitability in the Streptozotocin-diabetic rat", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 72, no. 2, pages 684 - 692, XP000869507 [DX] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * | [A] - SLUKA KA ET AL, "The effects of G-protein and protein kinase inhibitors on the behavioral responses of rats to intradermal injection of capsaicin.", PAIN, (1997), vol. 71, no. 2, pages 165 - 178, XP000869590 [A] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3959(97)03371-X | [X] - CODERRE TJ ET AL, "Intracellular messengers contributing to persistent nociception and hyperalgesia induced by L-glutamate and substance P in the rat formalin pain model.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, AUG 1 1994, 6 (8) P1328-34, (1994), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1328 - 34, XP000869767 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * | [X] - MUNRO F.E. ET AL, "Evidence for a role of protein kinase C in the sustained activation of rat dorsal horn neurons evoked by cutaneous mustard oil application", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1994), vol. 170, no. 2, pages 199 - 202, XP000869681 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(94)90318-2 | [X] - OHSAWA, MASAHIRO ET AL, "Modulation of the formalin-induced nociceptive response by diabetes: possible involvement of protein kinase C", BRAIN RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 803, no. 1,2, pages 198 - 203, XP000869976 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(98)00615-5 | [X] - CODERRE TJ, "Contribution of protein kinase C to central sensitization and persistent pain following tissue injury.", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1992), vol. 140, no. 2, pages 181 - 184, XP000869761 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(92)90097-Q | [X] - YASHPAL K ET AL, "Noxious thermal and chemical stimulation induce increases in 3H-phorbol 12,13-dibutyrate binding in spinal cord dorsal horn as well as persistent pain and hyperalgesia, which is reduced by inhibition of protein kinase C.", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 15, no. 5 part 1, pages 3263 - 3272, XP000869657 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * | [X] - LIN Q ET AL, "Inhibition of primate spinothalamic tract neurons by spinal glycine and GABA is reduced during central sensitization.", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, AUG 1996, 76 (2) P1005-14, (1996), vol. 76, no. 2, pages 1005 - 1014, XP000869667 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * | [DX] - MCGUIRK, S.M. ET AL, "G-protein mediation in nociceptive signal transduction: an investigation into the excitatory action of bradykinin in a subpopulation of cultured rat sensory neurons", NEUROSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 49, no. 1, pages 117 - 128, XP000869517 [DX] 1,2,5,6,12 * the whole document * * especially page 125, lefthand column, line 36-41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(92)90079-H | [A] - MAO J. ET AL, "Increases in protein kinase C gamma immunoreactivity in the spinal cord dorsal horn of rats with painful mononeuropathy", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, (1995), vol. 198, no. 2, pages 75 - 78, XP000869679 [A] 1-7,10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3940(95)11975-3 |