EP1098664 - CONJUGATES FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS AND ASSOCIATED TISSUE DAMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osprey Pharmaceuticals Limited 3400 Petro-Canada Centre, 150-6th Avenue SW Calgary Alberta T2P 3Y7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Osprey Pharmaceuticals Limited 3400 Petro-Canada Centre, 150-6th Avenue SW Calgary, Alberta T2P 3Y7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONALD, John, R. 60 Governor Drive SW Calgary, Alberta T3E 4Y9 / CA | 02 /
COGGINS, Philip, J. 4211, 5A Street SW Calgary, Alberta T2S 2G8 / CA | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99932572.3 | 21.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999CA00659 | Priority number, date | US19980120523 | 22.07.1998 Original published format: US 120523 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0004926 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1098664 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098664 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K48/00, C12N15/19, C12N15/62, C12N15/29, C12N15/31, C07K14/52, C07K19/00, C07K14/415, A61P29/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
A61K48/0033 (EP);
A61K47/62 (EP);
A61K47/642 (EP);
A61K47/6425 (EP);
A61K47/6811 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/20] | A61K47/48, A61K48/00, C12N15/19, C12N15/62, C12N15/29, C12N15/31, C07K14/52, C07K19/00, C07K14/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Extension states | AL | 15.01.2001 | LT | 15.01.2001 | LV | 15.01.2001 | MK | 15.01.2001 | RO | 15.01.2001 | SI | 15.01.2001 | Title | German: | KONJUGATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGSKRANKHEITEN UND VON ASSOZIERTER GEWEBESCHÄDIGUNG | [2001/20] | English: | CONJUGATES FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS AND ASSOCIATED TISSUE DAMAGE | [2001/20] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DEGATS TISSULAIRES SECONDAIRES, ETATS INFLAMMATOIRES ET AUTRES TROUBLES, ET COMPOSITIONS A CET EFFET | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03076150.6 / EP1346731 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.08.2003 | FI | 06.08.2003 | PT | 06.01.2004 | [2007/23] |
Former [2004/31] | FI | 06.08.2003 | |
PT | 06.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 06.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9012597 (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]) [X] 50-53,58 * page 3, line 3 - line 22 *; | [A]WO9118012 (BIOSPAN CORP [US]) [A] 1-79 * the whole document *; | [X]US5084556 (BROWN EUGENE L [US]) [X] 50-53,64 * column 5, line 31 - column 5, line 42 *; | [X]US5152980 (STROM TERRY B [US], et al) [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78* column 1, line 41 - line 52 *; | [A]WO9323062 (IMMUNOMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 1-79 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9325228 (WHITTIER INST DIABETES & ENDOC [US], et al) [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * page 4, line 6 - line 29 * * page 18, line 9 - line 15 *; | [X]WO9407535 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-43,65,73-75 * examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO9407542 (MALLINCKRODT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-43,65,73-75 * examples 1-8 *; | [X]US5326559 (MILLER D DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * column 4, line 37 - line 41 * * column 8, line 3 - line 17 * * column 11, line 67 - line 68 *; | [X]WO9512414 (REPLIGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1-47,65,73-75,79 * example 26 * * claims 16-22 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 9 *; | [X] - P ROBY ET AL, "Melanoma-specific cytotoxicity of a human MGSA/GROalpha C-terminal peptide conjugated to daunorubicin", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (1996), vol. 3, pages 175 - 179, XP000881561 [X] 1-43,65,73-75 * abstract * * "Cytotoxicity..Etc" on pages 177 to 178 * * discussion * | [X] - D I SILBERT, "Glycosaminoglycans of bovine aorta endothelial cells: Identification and localization by use of a platelet factor 4-fluorescein probe", JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 589 - 593, XP000881557 [X] 1-43,65,73-75 * abstract * | [X] - E RAY ET AL, "Receptor mediated endocytosis of IL-8: a fluorescent microscopic evidence and implication of the process in ligand induced biological response in human neutrophils", CYTOKINE, 1997, (199708), vol. 9, no. 8, pages 587 - 596, XP000881538 [X] 1-43,65,73-75 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.1997.0206 | [X] - RALPH, P., "Clinical and preclinical studies presented by the keystone symposium on arthritis", LYMPHOKINE AND CYTOKINE RESEARCH, (199308), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 261 - 263, XP000891639 [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * abstract * * page 262, column 1, line 29 - line 47 * | [X] - STROM, TERRY B. ET AL, "Interleukin-2 receptor-directed therapies: Antibody- or cytokine-based targeting molecules", ANNU. REV. MED. (1993), 44, 343-53, XP000915772 [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * page 347 - page 351 * | [X] - NAGPAL, SUNIL ET AL, "New dermatological agents for the treatment of psoriasis", ANNU. REP. MED. CHEM. (1997), 32, 201-210, XP000915751 [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * "Introduction" on page 201 and the "New targets" on page 207 to 208 with reference to "fusion proteins" * | [X] - ROBERGE, FRANCOIS G. ET AL, "Selective immunosuppression of activated T cells with the chimeric toxin IL - 2 -PE40. Inhibition of experimental autoimmune uveoretinitis", J. IMMUNOL. (1989), 143(11), 3498-502, XP002028689 [X] 50-64,67-71,76-78 * abstract * | [X] - SHEMYAKIN, I. G. ET AL, "Construction and expression in Escherichia coli cells of the fusion protein diphtheria toxin -human interleukin 2", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 119:40509, URL: STN, XP002141203 [X] 50-54 * abstract * | [ ] - MOL. BIOL. (MOSCOW) (1992), 26(5), 1088-98 | [X] - HUSAIN, SYED R. ET AL, "Complete regression of established human glioblastoma tumor xenograft by interleukin -4 toxin therapy", CANCER RES. (1998), 58(16), 3649-3653, XP000910254 [X] 50-53,64 * abstract * | [X] - MENEGHETTI, CAROLE M. ET AL, "Initial clinical experiences with an interleukin -2 fusion toxin (DAB486- IL - 2 )", TARGETED DIAGN. THER. (1992), 7(GENET. ENG. TOXINS), 395-401, XP000915730 [X] 50-53,64 * "III the chimeric fusion protein..Etc" on pages 396 to 399 * |