EP1078401 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A POWER MOSFET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/09] | POWER MOS TRANSISTOR WITH OVERTEMPERATURE PROTECTION CIRCUIT | ||
[2010/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states GKR Gesellschaft für Fahrzeugklimaregelung mbH Herrenwiesenweg 24 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERSEL, Walter Obere Burghalde 60 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
BREITLING, Wolfram Hermann-Hesse-Strasse 18/1 D-74343 Sachensheim / DE | 03 /
WEIBLE, Reinhold Helmulfstrasse 8 D-70437 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
FALLIANO, Rolf Michelauer Strasse 11 D-73635 Rudersberg-Steinenberg / DE | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Ralf Holger, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Behrens, Ralf Holger, et al Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Behrens, Ralf Holger, Dipl.-Phys. Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99932653.1 | 07.05.1999 | [2001/09] | WO1999DE01378 | Priority number, date | DE1998121834 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821834 | [2001/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960628 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078401 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078401 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02, H02H5/04 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/34 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES POWER-MOS-TRANSISTORS | [2010/07] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A POWER MOSFET | [2010/07] | French: | METHODE DE COMMANDE D'UN TRANSISTOR DE PUISSANCE A EFFET DE CHAMP | [2010/07] |
Former [2001/09] | POWER-MOS-TRANSISTOR MIT TEMPERATURSCHUTZSCHALTUNG | ||
Former [2001/09] | POWER MOS TRANSISTOR WITH OVERTEMPERATURE PROTECTION CIRCUIT | ||
Former [2001/09] | TRANSISTOR MOS DE PUISSANCE MUNI D'UN CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION DE LA TEMPERATURE | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9806142 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 3 - page 7, line 19 *; | [X]JPS6447077 ; | [X]US5726481 (MOODY PAUL T [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * figures 1,3,6 * * column 5, line 51 - line 54 * * column 5, line 63 - line 67 * * column 9, line 10 - column 11, line 10 * * column 12, line 26 - line 31 *; | [X]US5457419 (TIHANYI JENOE [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 58 - column 4, line 4 *; | [X]US5304837 (HIEROLD CHRISTOFER [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 58 *; | [X]EP0565807 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [X] 1,6,7,9 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 4 - line 19 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 32 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890608), vol. 13, no. 246, Database accession no. (E - 769), & JP01047077 A 19890221 (TDK CORP) [X] 1,3,5-9 * abstract * | Examination | EP0414499 | by applicant | EP0414499 | US5457419 |