EP1042928 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2006/41] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Takeshi Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMORI, Masaharu Sony Computer Entertain. Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Eiji Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-1, Akasaka 7-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/41] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard GB-London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99933129.1 | 28.07.1999 | [2000/41] | WO1999JP04044 | Priority number, date | JP19980213036 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21303698 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007386 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042928 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042928 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/14 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
H04W88/023 (EP,US);
H04B5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2006/41] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/41] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2000/41] | French: | SYSTEME D'EMISSION D'INFORMATIONS | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | FR | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | DE | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | BE | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | BE | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
DE | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 11.10.2006 | |
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
ES | 22.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5010547 (JOHNSON RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 54 *; | [X]US5159331 (PARK MICHAEL C [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 41 * * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 26; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0622966 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,8* column 4, line 9 - line 27 *; | [A]US5363090 (CANNON GREGORY L [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 66 *; | [A]US5374925 (OHKUMA NAOYA [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,8 * column 4, line 44 - line 60 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 24 * |