EP1115151 - FLAT SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND CONVERTER COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Hironori 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Kazuhiro 1-1, Omiko-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Atsuo 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Shuji H1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 05 /
SONOBE, Yukio 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 06 /
KATO, Mitsuo 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 07 /
SAWAHATA, Mamoru 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 08 /
HASEGAWA, Mitsuru 1-1, Omika-cho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/28] | Application number, filing date | 99933154.9 | 29.07.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999JP04072 | Priority number, date | JP19980224030 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: JP 22403098 | JP19980230448 | 17.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23044898 | [2001/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008683 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115151 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/02, H01L23/04, H01L25/04 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
H01L23/051 (EP);
H01L23/02 (KR);
H01L23/3185 (EP);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2224/451 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01012 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01023 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/0104 (EP);
H01L2924/01042 (EP);
H01L2924/01047 (EP);
H01L2924/01052 (EP);
H01L2924/01074 (EP);
H01L2924/01078 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/09701 (EP);
H01L2924/10253 (EP);
H01L2924/12044 (EP);
H01L2924/1301 (EP);
H01L2924/13034 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
H01L2924/13055 (EP);
H01L2924/1306 (EP);
H01L2924/13091 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H01L2924/30107 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/13034, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/21] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FLACHE HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG, METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG, UND DIESE ENTHALTENDEN WANDLER | [2001/28] | English: | FLAT SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME, AND CONVERTER COMPRISING THE SAME | [2001/28] | French: | COMPOSANT PLAT A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET CONVERTISSEUR COMPRENANT CE COMPOSANT | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2001 | Translation filed | 06.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 26.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS589344 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]JPH0738082 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JPS60163760U |