EP1048409 - PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEM PARALLEL PLANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAI CO., LTD. 5-15, Nishi-Gotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | [2006/43] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states HAMAI CO., LTD. 5-15, Nishi-Gotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Junpei 24-10, Ikebukurohoncho 4-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-0011 / JP | 02 /
KUNII, Yutaka 29-1, Kamishibutarecho Ashikaga-city, Tochigi 326-0335 / JP | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99933239.8 | 03.08.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999JP04170 | Priority number, date | JP19980234553 | 20.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23455398 | [2000/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010771 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048409 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048409 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B24B37/08 (EP,US);
B24B37/11 (EP,US);
B24B47/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/22] |
Former [2000/44] | BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PLANETENGETRIEBESYSTEM FÜR DOPPELSEITIGE LÄPPMASCHINE | [2000/44] | English: | PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEM PARALLEL PLANER | [2000/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PLANS PARALLELES POUR SYSTEME DE TRAIN D'ENGRENAGES PLANETAIRE | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1999 | Translation filed | 15.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0596466 (SPEEDFAM CO LTD); | [A]JPH0425372 (SEIKO ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS); | [A]JPS5440391 (MO BUISUSHIEE TEKHN UCHIRITSUS) |