EP1019622 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR DIRECT INJECTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Hirofumi Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
KUJI, Youichi Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
KONO, Seiko Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 760-8670 / JP | 04 /
YAMASHITA, Hiroyuki Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
ARAKI, Keiji Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Laufhütte, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99933247.1 | 03.08.1999 | [2000/29] | WO1999JP04180 | Priority number, date | JP19980232243 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: JP 23224398 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008328 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019622 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019622 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D41/40, F01N3/20 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
F02D41/024 (EP,US);
F02D41/06 (KR);
F02D41/402 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
F02D41/3023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG | [2000/29] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR DIRECT INJECTION ENGINE | [2000/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A INJECTION DIRECTE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 14.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.10.2004 | ES | 07.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/27] | ES | 07.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0856655 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6-9,13,15-18 * column 2, line 39 - column 5, line 36 * * column 7, line 19 - column 16, line 10 * * claims 1-5,7,10-14 *; | [A]US5482017 (BREHOB DIANA D [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9,10,14-18 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 4 * * column 3, line 58 - line 60 * * column 5, line 1 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0710771 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9-12,14,17-19 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 6 - line 9 * * column 6, line 25 - line 53 * * column 7, line 30 - line 46 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0719937 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,7-9,12,13,17,18 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 56 *; | [A]EP0826869 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,7,8,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 8 *; | [A]JPH07151001 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07151001 A 19950613 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 10,11 * abstract * | Examination | JPH04231645 |