EP1055143 - CASCADING OF TUNABLE OPTICAL FILTER ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states E.I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company Legal Patents Barley Mill Plaza 25 Wilmington, Delaware 19880-0025 / US | ||
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORWOOD, Robert, A. 203 North Union Avenue Cranford, NJ 07016 / US | 02 /
SOSSEN, David, W. 23 Smithfield Drive Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 03 /
RUDASILL, Meade, H. 4 Ursula Court Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99934345.2 | 22.02.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US03853 | Priority number, date | US19980075512P | 20.02.1998 Original published format: US 75512 P | US19990251893 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 251893 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9942875 | Date: | 26.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055143 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055143 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/34, G02F1/01 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
G02B6/29362 (EP);
G02B6/29395 (EP);
G02F1/0147 (EP);
G02F1/212 (EP);
G02F2201/06 (EP);
G02F2201/307 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/48] | Title | German: | HINTEREINANDERSCHALTUNG VON ABSTIMMBAREN OPTISCHEN FILTERELEMENTEN | [2000/48] | English: | CASCADING OF TUNABLE OPTICAL FILTER ELEMENTS | [2000/48] | French: | MONTAGE EN CASCADE D'ELEMENTS DE FILTRE OPTIQUES ACCORDABLES | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.12.2003 | [2008/18] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS61151603 ; | [Y]US4632517 (ASHER SANFORD A [US]) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 5 - line 42 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 64; figures 1,10 *; | [Y]US5103332 (KANEKO SHUZO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 29 * * column 9, line 26 - line 39; figure 8 *; | [A]US5671307 (LAUZON JOCELYN [CA], et al) [A] 3,6,7 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 31; figure 1 * * column A *; | [Y]US5706375 (MIHAILOV STEPHEN J [CA], et al) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]WO9804954 (ITALTEL SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10 * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 25 * * page 12, line 9 - page 17, line 14; figures 5,6,10,13; claim 1 * [Y] 5,7-9; | [A]WO9807058 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 2* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861127), vol. 010, no. 351, Database accession no. (P - 520), & JP61151603 A 19860710 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 9 * abstract * |