EP1098763 - MULTILAYERED, SYMMETRICAL, NON-CURLING COEXTRUDED DEEP-DRAWN FOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wipak Walsrode GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1661 29656 Walsrode / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Wolff Walsrode AG 29655 Walsrode / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASCHEL, Gregor Uferstrasse 37 D-29699 Bomlitz / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger, Helga, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Kutzenberger, Helga, Dr., et al Kutzenberger & Wolff, Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Pettrich, Klaus-Günter, Dr., et al c/o Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99934542.4 | 29.06.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP04479 | Priority number, date | DE19981030977 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19830977 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0002724 | Date: | 20.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098763 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098763 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B65D65/40 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2307/746 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2377/00 (US);
C08L23/0846 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/02, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/20] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE, SYMMETRISCHE, ROLLNEIGUNGSFREIE, COEXTRUDIERTE TIEFZIEHFOLIE | [2001/20] | English: | MULTILAYERED, SYMMETRICAL, NON-CURLING COEXTRUDED DEEP-DRAWN FOIL | [2001/20] | French: | FEUILLE A EMBOUTIR COEXTRUDEE, SYMETRIQUE, A PLUSIEURS COUCHES ET N'AYANT PAS TENDANCE A S'ENROULER | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 10.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0219329 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [AD] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3618775 (AUCH FOLIEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 52 *; | [A]US5419795 (WOOD JOHN C [CA], et al) [A] 1* column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 56; figures 3-7; example 1 * |