EP1099108 - AGGLUTINATION ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axis Shield ASA Ulvenveien 87 0510 Oslo / NO | [2001/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDREHAGEN, Erling Axis Biochemicals ASA, Ulvenveien 87 N-0510 Oslo / NO | 02 /
BREMNES, Dag Axis Biochemicals ASA, Ulvenveien 87 N-0510 Oslo / NO | 03 /
GOGSTAD, Geir Olav Axis Biochemicals ASA, Ulvenveien 87 N-0510 Oslo / NO | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Philip Matthew Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Dixon, Philip Matthew Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99934948.3 | 23.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999GB02398 | Priority number, date | GB19980016088 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: GB 9816088 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005571 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099108 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/82 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G01N21/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGGLUTINATIONSTEST | [2001/20] | English: | AGGLUTINATION ASSAYS | [2001/20] | French: | REACTIONS D'AGGLUTINATION | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/02] | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8907255 (CETUS CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,12,23 * figures 1,3; claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO9411841 (QUATRO BIOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 13-16 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,2,5-8 *; | [X]US5541417 (XIONG YONGLI H [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,12,23 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE4117024 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,12,23 * abstract *; | [X]EP0637744 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,12,23 * claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP0455125 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,12,23 * page 5, line 27 - page 8, line 13; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0583626 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,12,23 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9222880 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,3,12,23 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0433005 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,12,23 * column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 3 * |