EP1105215 - L-TYPE ZEOLITE CATALYST COMPRISING PLATINUM, HALOGEN AND GROUP IB METAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP 1301 McKinney, 34th Floor Houston, TX 77010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP 1301 McKinney, 34th Floor Houston, TX 77010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUNAGA, Tetsuya 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba-ken 299-0205 / JP | 02 /
SUGIMOTO, Michio 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba-ken 299-0205 / JP | 03 /
INNES, Robert, A. Chevron Chemical Company Richmond Tech. Ctr. 100 Chevron Way Richmond, CA 94802-0627 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935111.7 | 09.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999JP04298 | Priority number, date | US19980134164 | 14.08.1998 Original published format: US 134164 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0009263 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105215 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105215 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/61, C10G35/095, C07C5/41 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C10G35/095 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/62 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0201 (KR);
C07C5/415 (EP,US);
C07C5/417 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN PLATIN, HALOGEN UND METALL DER GRUPPE IB ENTHALTENDER L-ZEOLITHKATALYSATOR | [2001/24] | English: | L-TYPE ZEOLITE CATALYST COMPRISING PLATINUM, HALOGEN AND GROUP IB METAL | [2001/24] | French: | CATALYSEUR ZEOLITE DE TYPE L COMPRENANT DU PLATINE, UN HALOGENE ET UN METAL DE GROUPE B | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | CH | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | LI | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
CH | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
LI | 06.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0201856 (LIGHT OIL UTILIZATION RES ASS [JP]) [A] 1,3-7; | [D]JPS6257653 (LIGHT OIL UTILIZATION RES ASS); | [A]EP0334562 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,5-7* claims 1,12-15,24,25 *; | [A]EP0498182 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1,3-7; | [D]JPH0549936 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) |