EP1109873 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coöperatieve Verkoop- en Productievereniging van Aardappelmeel en Derivaten 'AVEBE' B.A. Beneden Oosterdiep 27 NL-9641 JA Veendam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Coöperatieve Verkoop- en Productievereniging van Aardappelmeel en Derivaten 'AVEBE' B.A. Beneden Oosterdiep 27 NL-9641 JA Veendam / NL | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Coöperatieve Verkoop- en Productievereniging van Aardappelmeel en Derivaten 'AVEBE' B.A. Beneden Oosterdiep 27 NL-9641 JA Veendam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLEEKER, Ido, Pieter Poldermolen 22 NL-9791 LS Ten Boer / NL | 02 /
KAMMINGA, Willem W.A. Scholtenweg 37 NL-9636 BP Zuidbroek / NL | 03 /
KESSELMANS, Ronald, Peter, Wilhelmus Kromkampen 11 NL-9468 HK Annen / NL | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99935175.2 | 19.07.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999NL00459 | Priority number, date | EP19980202489 | 23.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98202489 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005319 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1109873 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109873 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09J103/04, C08B35/00, C09J103/14 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
C09J103/04 (EP,US);
C08B35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Extension states | AL | 22.02.2001 | LT | 22.02.2001 | LV | 22.02.2001 | MK | 22.02.2001 | RO | 22.02.2001 | SI | 22.02.2001 | Title | German: | KLEBEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/26] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION | [2001/26] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHESIVE | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.06.2005 | CY | 19.07.2005 | LU | 19.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | PT | 14.11.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/23] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
CY | 19.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
DK | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
PT | 14.11.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3950593 (BOMBALL WILLIAM A, et al); | [A]US4014727 (MUSSELMAN CAMILLUS B, et al); | [Y]EP0458233 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, column 5, line 20 - line 38 *; | [Y]US5403871 (EDEN JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 44 *; | [Y]EP0799837 (AVEBE COOP VERKOOP PROD [NL]) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 22 *; | [X]WO9743225 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [X] 1-11 * page 13, line 13 - line 21 *; | [A]EP0852235 (CHEMSTAR PRODUCTS COMPANY [US]) |