EP1097423 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR INCREASING THE USER VALUE OF RECOMMENDATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Net Perceptions Inc. Suite 300, 11200 West 78th Street Minneapolis, MN 55344-3814 / US | [2001/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEGANSKI, Paul 6461 Regency Lane Minneapolis, MN 55344 / US | 02 /
KONSTAN, Joseph, A. 582 Cretin Avenue South St. Paul, MN 55116 / US | 03 /
RIEDL, John, T. 1340 California Avenue West Falcon Heights, MN 55108 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99935431.9 | 07.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999US15290 | Priority number, date | US19980118025 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: US 118025 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0004464 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097423 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/60 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
G06F16/335 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99935 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND ERZEUGNIS ZUM ERHÖHEN DES GEBRAUCHSWERTS VON EMPFEHLUNGEN | [2001/19] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD AND ARTICLE OF MANUFACTURE FOR INCREASING THE USER VALUE OF RECOMMENDATIONS | [2001/19] | French: | SYSTEME, PROCEDE ET ARTICLE POUR AMELIORER LA VALEUR DES RECOMMANDATIONS AUX UTILISATEURS | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0751471 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1,20,41* abstract *; | [A]WO9726729 (ROBINSON GARY B [US]) [A] 1,20,41 * abstract *; | [A]US5704017 (HECKERMAN DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 1,20,41 * abstract * * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 55; figures 1,2 * * column 18, line 6 - column 20, line 64 *; | [A]WO9802835 (POST DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,20,41 * abstract * * page 5, line 5 - page 29, line 28; figures 1-5 * |