EP1121691 - PYROLYTIC DECOMPOSITION OF ORGANIC WASTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Studsvik, Inc. 151 T.C. Runion Road Erwin Tennessee 37650 / US | [2009/18] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Studsvik, Inc. 151 T.C. Runion Road Erwin, Tennessee 37650 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Studsvik, Inc. Suite 115, 111 Stonemark Lane Columbia, SC 29210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, J., Bradley 2501 North Road 80 Pasco, WA 99301 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99935955.7 | 28.07.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999US16979 | Priority number, date | US19980123774 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: US 123774 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0007193 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1121691 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121691 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/32, F23G5/30, G21F9/06 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
G21F9/02 (EP,US);
F23G5/027 (KR);
G21F9/06 (EP,US);
G21F9/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | G21F9/32, F23G5/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYROLYTISCHE ZERSETZUNG VON ORGANISCHEN ABFÄLLEN | [2001/32] | English: | PYROLYTIC DECOMPOSITION OF ORGANIC WASTES | [2001/32] | French: | DECOMPOSITION PYROLITIQUE DES DECHETS ORGANIQUES | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.04.2009 | BE | 29.04.2009 | CY | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IT | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | IE | 28.07.2009 | LU | 28.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | ES | 09.08.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IT | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.07.2009 | ||
LU | 28.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
BE | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 29.04.2009 | |
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.08.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US5536896 (HESBOEL ROLF [SE], et al) [DX] 1-29* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4053432 (TIEPEL ERICH W, et al); | [A]US4259910 (WARREN JEFFERY H, et al); | [A]US4555361 (BUCKLEY LEO P [CA], et al); | [A]US4938156 (YAHATA TANEAKI [JP]); | [A]US5325797 (MEI JOSEPH S [US], et al); | [A]US5471937 (KOSKY JOHN P [US], et al) |