EP1060078 - THERMOPLASTIC FILM FOR PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLLAK, Herbert, Franz 7, chemin du Pré de l'Oeuf CH-1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | 02 /
RIOUX, Bernard 1, place du Sud F-92800 Paris-La Défense / FR | [2002/33] |
Former [2000/51] | 01 /
WOLLOCK, Herbert, Franz 7, chemin du Pré de l'Oeuf CH-1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | ||
02 /
RIOUX, Bernard 1, place du Sud F-92800 Paris-La Défense / FR | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/51] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99936051.4 | 25.02.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999US04046 | Priority number, date | EP19980200607 | 26.02.1998 Original published format: EP 98200607 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9943498 | Date: | 02.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060078 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060078 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/20] | B32B27/32, B65D71/06, B65D65/40 | ||
Former IPC [2000/51] | B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/51] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHER FILM FÜR VERPACKUNGEN | [2000/51] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC FILM FOR PACKAGING | [2000/51] | French: | FILM THERMOPLASTIQUE DE CONDITIONNEMENT | [2000/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2000 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19521244 (FAYARD & RAVEL) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 5 *; | [D]GB2290500 (...); | [DA]US5630307 (CATHALA GEORGES) [DA] 1-5 * column 1, line 43 - line 61; claim - * * column 2, line 41 - line 50 *; | [DA]EP0537080 (SODAP ;DU PONT INT (CH)) [DA] 1-5 * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 1; claim - *; | [A]US4098406 (OTTEN NORMAN J ET AL) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 63; claim - * | International search | [X]GB2290500 ; | [Y]EP0537080 ; | [A]US5630307 |