EP1106016 - METHOD FOR AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIOSCOPY 3 rue de l'Est 75020 Paris / FR | [2009/26] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states APLM 3 Rue de l'Est 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states ALLIO, Pierre 81, rue de la Mare 75020 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allio, Pierre 81, rue de la Mare 75020 Paris / FR | [2008/38] |
Former [2001/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc, et al CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99936683.4 | 04.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999FR01927 | Priority number, date | FR19980010384 | 13.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810384 | [2001/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010332 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106016 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106016 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04, G02B27/22 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
H04N13/305 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
G02B30/27 (US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US);
H04N13/351 (EP,US);
H04N13/349 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHER BILDER | [2001/24] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY | [2001/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE AUTOSTEREOSCOPIQUE | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | IE | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9426072 (ALLIO PIERRE [FR]) [DX] 1,2,13-24* the whole document * | by applicant | WO9426072 | EP0791847 |