EP1130428 - DISPERSION COMPENSATING FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUNO, Toshiaki Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Shinji Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | 03 /
KASHIWADA, Tomonori Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8588 / JP | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99937081.0 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999JP04413 | Priority number, date | JP19980265453 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26545398 | [2001/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017685 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1130428 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/16, G02B6/22 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
G02B6/02242 (EP,US);
G02B6/02261 (EP,US);
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
G02B6/03644 (EP,US);
G02B6/29377 (EP,US);
H04B10/2525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FASER MIT DISPERSIONSKOMPENSATION | [2001/36] | English: | DISPERSION COMPENSATING FIBER | [2001/36] | French: | FIBRE A COMPENSATION DE DISPERSION | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2001 | Translation filed | 30.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 15.06.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 13.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH1039155 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPH09127354 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH10221562 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC); | [A]JPH08313750 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH08136758 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPH07270636 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [A]JPH06222235 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [A]JPH0611620 (CORNING INC); | [XP]JPH10319266 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A] - NIELSEN L.G. ET AL., "Large volume manufacturing of dispersion-compensating fibers", OFC '98 TECHNICAL DIGEST, JICST, (19980529), pages 24 - 25, XP002925743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/OFC.1998.657172 | [A] - M. ONISHI ET AL., "Third-order dispersion compensating fibres for non-zero dispersion shifted fibre links", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19961205), vol. 32, no. 25, pages 2344 - 2345, XP002925744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19961584 | [AP] - T. TSUDA ET AL., "Broad band dispersion slope compensation of dispersion shifted fiber using negative slope fiber", ECOC '98, (19980920), vol. 1, pages 233 - 234, XP002925745 |