EP1165378 - ROTATABLE LABEL SYSTEM AND METHOD OF APPLYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/01] | ROTATING LABEL SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2004/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stephen Key Design, LLC 10212 Whitetail Drive Oakdale, CA 95361 / US | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEY, Stephen, M. Stephen Key Design, LLC, 10212 Whitetail Drive Oakdale, CA 95361 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler, Käck, Fiener et Col. Vorderer Anger 268 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99937282.4 | 16.07.1999 | [2002/01] | WO1999US16172 | Priority number, date | US19980126010 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: US 126010 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006455 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165378 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165378 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65C3/08, B65C3/12, B65C3/16, B32B7/12, B32B7/14, B65C9/20, G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B65C9/20 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (KR);
B65C3/08 (KR);
G09F3/02 (KR);
Y10T156/1033 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | B65C3/08, B65C3/12, B65C3/16, B32B7/12, B32B7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | 28.02.2001 | LT | 28.02.2001 | LV | 28.02.2001 | SI | 28.02.2001 | Title | German: | DREHBARE ETIKETTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN DERSELBEN | [2004/15] | English: | ROTATABLE LABEL SYSTEM AND METHOD OF APPLYING SAME | [2004/15] | French: | ETIQUETTES TOURNANTES ET PROCEDE D'APPLICATION | [2004/15] |
Former [2002/01] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFROLLEN VON ETIKETTEN | ||
Former [2002/01] | ROTATING LABEL SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2002/01] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DES ETIQUETTES TOURNANTES | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]DK85214C (IRMA FABRIKERNE AS); | [A]US2860431 (BARNUM JR HOWARD J); | [A]US4844760 (DICKEY DANIEL M [US]); | [A]US5116452 (EDER ERICH [DE]); | [A]US5321933 (SEIFERT GUENTER [DE], et al); | [X]US5639529 (GOZDECKI RONALD M [US], et al); | [AP]US5800893 (HARDEN JOHN MICHAEL [US]) |