EP1086050 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WATER SANITISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquagem Holdings Pty Limited Level 1, 142 Union Street The Junction, NSW 2291 / AU | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REX, Hans 57-59 Brown Street West Wallsend, NSW 2286 / AU | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99937819.3 | 05.03.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999AU00137 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP02161 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: AU PP216198 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944949 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086050 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/76, C02F1/50, C02F1/68, C02F1/00, C02F1/72 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A61L2/186 (EP,KR,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/238 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/505 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/722 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/76 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | C02F1/76, C02F1/50, C02F1/68, C02F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABWASSER | [2001/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WATER SANITISATION | [2001/13] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE L'EAU | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 05.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2585148 (CARVALHO MANUEL DE [FR]) [X] 6-10 *the whole document*; | [X]US4915955 (GOEMOERI JANOS [CH]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 56 * * examples II,IV *; | [A]WO9734835 (BIO LAB INC [US]) | International search | [A]AU7749894 ; | [A]WO9734834 (BIO LAB INC [US]); | [AP]WO9822397 (GACHES CHIMIE SPECIALITES [FR], et al) |