EP1060119 - Method and assembly for marking paper, board and cellulose web rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/51] | METHOD OF MARKING PAPER, BOARD AND CELLULOSE WEB ROLLS | ||
[2002/48] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2003/18] |
Former [2000/51] | For all designated states Valmet Corporation Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEMINEN, Esko Pihakuusentie 1 FIN-05460 Hyvinkää / FI | 02 /
AIMONEN, Pertti Päijänteenkatu 15 B 20 FIN-15140 Lahti / FI | [2000/51] | Representative(s) | Hovi, Simo Pekka Tapani, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/51] | Hovi, Simo, et al Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 99937918.3 | 02.03.1999 | [2000/51] | WO1999FI00161 | Priority number, date | FI19980000474 | 02.03.1998 Original published format: FI 980474 | [2000/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9944935 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1060119 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1060119 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/06, B65B61/02, G06K1/12, B07C3/18 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
B65H35/02 (EP,US);
B65H18/28 (EP,US);
D06H1/00 (EP,US);
G06K1/121 (EP,US);
B65H2511/40 (EP,US);
Y10S414/124 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/40, B65H2220/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2000/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Markieren von Papier-, Wellpappe- und Cellulosebahnrollen | [2002/48] | English: | Method and assembly for marking paper, board and cellulose web rolls | [2002/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de marquage de rouleaux de feuilles continues de papier, de carton et de cellulose | [2002/48] |
Former [2000/51] | VERFAHREN ZUM MARKIEREN VON PAPIER-, WELLPAPPE-, ODER CELLULOSEBAHNROLLEN | ||
Former [2000/51] | METHOD OF MARKING PAPER, BOARD AND CELLULOSE WEB ROLLS | ||
Former [2000/51] | PROCEDE DE MARQUAGE DE ROULEAUX DE FEUILLES CONTINUES DE PAPIER, DE CARTON ET DE CELLULOSE | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2004
22.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Voith Paper Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2004
22.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Voith Paper Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | 17.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/48] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3204243 (DATAWAY OY [FI]); | [A]US4593643 (SAVIOLO GIUSEPPE [IT]); | [Y]US5262804 (PETIGREW ROBERT M [GB], et al); | [A]GB2286822 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) | Examination | DE4231167 |