EP1064439 - THERMAL AND ACOUSTICAL INSULATING SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lydall, Inc. P.O. Box 151 Manchester, CT 06045-0151 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states LYDALL, INC. One Colonial Road, P.O. Box 151 Manchester, CT 06045-0151 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIERS, John, J. 145 Ivy Circle Elkin, NC 28621 / US | 02 /
BYRD, Timothy, L. Route 1 Box 390 Boonville, NC 27011 / US | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/01] | Fruchard, Guy CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99937959.7 | 10.02.1999 | [2001/01] | WO1999US02669 | Priority number, date | US19980033852 | 03.03.1998 Original published format: US 33852 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9945216 | Date: | 10.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064439 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064439 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, B32B17/04, D04H13/00, B60R13/08, F16F7/00, F16F15/00, G10K11/168 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
G10K11/162 (EP,US);
E04B1/82 (KR);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
D04H1/485 (EP,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,US);
D04H1/559 (EP,US);
D04H11/08 (EP,US);
F16F1/366 (EP,US);
F16F3/087 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/01] | E04B1/82, E04B1/84, F16F7/00, F16F15/00, B32B3/02, B32B33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | THERMISCHE UND AKKUSTISCHE ABSCHIRMUNG | [2001/01] | English: | THERMAL AND ACOUSTICAL INSULATING SHIELD | [2001/01] | French: | ECRAN THERMIQUE ET ACOUSTIQUE | [2001/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
ES | 25.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0027945 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * figure 2; claims 1-10 *; | [DY]US4522876 (HIERS JOHN J [US]) [DY] 1-20 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 54 * * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 2 *; | [A]US5658634 (RAGLAND G WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-7,9-15 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 6 * * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5666691 (BEALING ANDREW A [US], et al) [A] 1,9* column 4, line 1 - line 7 * | International search | [A]US1823405 (MARCUS MAZER); | [A]US4389442 (PICKENS JR ROBERT C, et al) |