EP1207943 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING PURGE DUST FROM CEMENT PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/22] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING PURGE DUST | ||
[2004/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. CIMENTERIES CBR CEMENTBEDRIJVEN N.V. chaussée de la Hulpe, 185 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [2004/27] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states S.A. CIMENTERIES C.B.R. CEMENTBEDRIJVEN N.V. Chaussée de la Hulpe, 185 1170 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERAUGE, Hubert 22, Drève Bolsac B-7540 Quartes / BE | 02 /
COLLEE, Jean-Benoît 93, rue Basse Mehagne B-4053 Embourg / BE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 99938069.4 | 04.08.1999 | [2002/22] | WO1999BE00099 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0110503 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1207943 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1207943 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A62D3/00 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C04B7/365 (EP);
A62D3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/45] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON ENTLÜFTUNGSSTAUB AUS ZEMENTHERSTELLUNG | [2004/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING PURGE DUST FROM CEMENT PRODUCTION | [2004/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE POUSSIERES DE PURGE D'USINE CIMENTIERE | [2004/25] |
Former [2002/22] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON ENTLÜFTUNGSSTAUB | ||
Former [2002/22] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING PURGE DUST | ||
Former [2002/22] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE POUSSIERES DE PURGE | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | GB | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | IT | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | DK | 03.02.2005 | GR | 03.02.2005 | SE | 03.02.2005 | DE | 04.02.2005 | ES | 14.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
SE | 03.02.2005 | ||
DE | 04.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GB | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
NL | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
DE | 04.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
DK | 03.02.2005 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
ES | 14.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4005436 (HOELTER HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE4317338 (DYCKERHOFF & WIDMANN AG [DE]); | [A]FR2762219 (SCREG [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 9 * * page 6, lines 9-25 * * page 12, lines 15-24 * * claim - *; | [A]FR2770159 (RECUPYL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 4; examples 1,2 * |