EP1098696 - POLYELECTROLYTE COVERINGS ON BIOLOGICAL TEMPLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEU, Björn Invalidenstrasse 101 D-10115 Berlin / DE | 02 /
BÄUMLER, Hans Klaustaler Strasse 30 D-13187 Berlin / DE | 03 /
DONATH, Edwin Dreetzer Strasse 1 D-16845 Giesenhorst / DE | 04 /
MOYA, Sergio Karolingerplatz 1 D-14052 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SUKHORUKOV, Gleb Pushino Mikroraion AB-5-33 Moscow District, 142292 / RU | 06 /
MÖHWALD, Helmuth Dr.-Gebauer-Strasse 21 D-55411 Bingen / DE | 07 /
CARUSO, Frank Roennebergstrasse 6 D-12161 Berlin / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99938268.2 | 15.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP05063 | Priority number, date | EP19980113181 | 15.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98113181 | DE19991007552 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907552 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0003797 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098696 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098696 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1098696 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, B01J13/22 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B01J13/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/5089 (EP,US);
B01J13/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | POLYELEKTROLYTHÜLLEN AUF BIOLOGISCHEN TEMPLATEN | [2001/20] | English: | POLYELECTROLYTE COVERINGS ON BIOLOGICAL TEMPLATES | [2001/20] | French: | REVETEMENT POLYELECTROLYTIQUE DE SPECIMENS BIOLOGIQUES | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M24) | 22.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
01.09.2009
WITHDRAWN EyeSense GmbH Stockstädter Str. 17 63762 Grossostheim / DE Opponent's representative Stößel, Matthias Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
01.09.2009
WITHDRAWN EyeSense GmbH Stockstädter Str. 17 63762 Grossostheim / DE Opponent's representative Stößel, Matthias Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2008
WITHDRAWN EyeSense GmbH Stockstädter Str. 17 63762 Grossostheim / DE Opponent's representative Stößel, Matthias Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | 11.09.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2009 | 13.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.12.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.05.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | IE | 07.11.2007 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | AT | 15.07.2008 | LU | 15.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/28] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
AT | 15.07.2008 | ||
LU | 15.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | CY | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
AT | 15.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | DK | 07.11.2007 | |
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 07.11.2007 | |
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 07.11.2007 | |
IE | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | DK | 07.11.2007 | |
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 07.11.2007 | |
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 07.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9526714 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-16 *; | [X]WO9618498 (ADVANCED SURFACE TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,14,15,19,20,25,26,29 * claims 1-19 *; | [X]WO9630409 (USTAV MAKROMOLEKULARNI CHEMIE [CZ], et al) [X] 1,14,15,19,20,25,26,29 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9814180 (KIRPOTIN DMITRI [US], et al) [X] 1,14-16,19,20,25,26,29,30* claims 1-16 * | Examination | DE19812083 | - CARUSO F.; DONATH E.; MÖHWALD H., "INFLUENCE OF POLYELECTROLYTE MULTILAYER COATINGS ON FOERSTER RESONANCE ENERGY TRANSFER BETWEEN 6-CARBOXYFLUORESCEIN AND RHODAMINE B-LABELED PARTICLES IN AQUEOUS SOLUTION MATERIALS", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, WASHINGTON, (1998), vol. 102, pages 2011 - 2016, XP000852731 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp980198y | Opposition | DE4026978 | WO9316687 | DE4312970 | EP0782853 | - G.B. SUKHORUKOV ET AL., "Layer-by-layer self assembly of polyelectrolytes on colloidal particles", G.B. SUKHORUKOV ET AL., ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., Colloids and surfaces A:Physicochemical and Engineering Aspects 137, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., (1998), XP000852906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-7757(98)00213-1 |